CA AB74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 14.2 (commencing with Section 53590) to Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 74 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB74 Chiu et al. By Glazer (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 74 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-14 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 3275.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2683.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 2054.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-09AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH.
2017-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2016-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2016-12-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code53590New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback