CA AB739 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 25722.11 of the Public Resources Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State vehicle fleet: purchases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 739 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB739 Chau By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 739 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23.).
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2822.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 11).
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 1982.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26).
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25722.11New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback