CA AB739 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10531.7 to the Water Code, relating to integrated regional water management plans.
Title
Integrated Regional Water Management Plans: conveyance projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 739 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 739 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1576.) |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27513 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10531.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |