CA AB732 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5358.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3405, 3406, 3409, 4023.5, 4023.6, and 4028 of, and to add Sections 3408 and 4023.8 to, the Penal Code, relating to incarcerated persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County jails: prisons: incarcerated pregnant persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 732 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB732 Bonta et al. By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 732 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5358.).
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3903.)
2020-01-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
2020-01-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3405Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3406Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3408New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code3409Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4023.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4023.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4023.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code4028Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback