CA AB732 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9086 and 9087 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 88002 and 88003 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Bond measures: ballot pamphlet: Legislative Analyst:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 732 BUCHANAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB732 Buchanan By Correa (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB732 Buchanan By Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 732 BUCHANAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB732 Buchanan By Correa (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB732 Buchanan By Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 732 BUCHANAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3212.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2409.). | |
2011-09-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2011-08-25 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2008.). | |
2011-07-14 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1568.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9086 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9087 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9088.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 88002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 88003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |