CA AB731 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4018.3 of the Penal Code, relating to county jails.
Title
County jails: recidivism: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 731 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB731 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Portantino (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 731 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB731 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Portantino (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 731 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5017.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1721.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1625.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4018.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |