CA AB73 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1710.2 of the Civil Code, relating to real property, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Real property: disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 73 WALDRON Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 73 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB73 Waldron By Monning Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 73 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6429.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6243.) |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5263.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Monning. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5265.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5265.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 9). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3475.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 18. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1710.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |