CA AB729 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26031, 26054, 26070, 26140, and 26152 of, and to add Sections 26036.1, 26141, and 26142 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to marijuana.
Title
Nonmedical marijuana: licensee regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26036.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB729 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB729 |