CA AB721 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 714.6 to the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Covenants and restrictions: affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 721 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB721 Bloom By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 721 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB721 Bloom By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 721 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2732.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2309.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 1). |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 1845.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 714.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |