CA AB72 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 71160 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental protection.
Title
Environmental protection: coastal adaptation projects: natural infrastructure: regulatory review and permitting: report.
Sponsors
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 72 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB72 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 72 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB72 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 72 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2839.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1621.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71160 | New Code | See Bill Text |