CA AB72 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65585 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Asse ? (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 72 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB72 Santiago et al. By Atkins (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 72 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3508.).
2017-09-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.)
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2961.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 17).
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2053.)
2017-05-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1852.)
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2016-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2016-12-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback