CA AB72 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1371.30, 1371.31, and 1371.9 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10112.8, 10112.81, and 10112.82 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: out-of-network coverage.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 72 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB72 Bonta By Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 72 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB72 Bonta By Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 72 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6534.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6474.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5488.). |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5451.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5433.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (September 10). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1107.). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 18. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1371.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184 | New Code | See Bill Text |