CA AB72 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71253 of the Water Code, relating to municipal water districts.
Title
Municipal water district: board of directors.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB72 Holden (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 72 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 72 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:35 p.m. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1045.). |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 879.) |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 71253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |