CA AB718 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1506 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to pest abatement.
Title
Mosquito abatement and vector control districts: managed wetland habitat: memoranda of understanding.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 718 Frazier Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB718 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 718 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB718 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 718 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3424.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2911.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1785.) |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |