CA AB718 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50034 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB718 Chu By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB718 Chu By Hueso (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 718 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB718 Chu By Hueso (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 718 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 14. Page 2289.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2289.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 1686.) |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 13). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 14602.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22506.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 22651.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |