CA AB716 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 471, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 471, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33050, 64000, and 64001 of, to amend and renumber the heading of Part 37 (commencing with Section 64100) of, to add the heading of Part 37 (commencing with Section 64001) to, to add Part 38 (commencing with Section 65000) to, and to repeal Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 52850) of Part 28 of, Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to public elementary and secondary schools.
Title
Public elementary and secondary schools: consolidated applications for funding: school plans for student achievement: schoolsite councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 716 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB716 O'Donnell By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 716 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB716 O'Donnell By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 716 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 471, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6986.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | (Com. on ED.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5791.). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 1913.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52850 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 58820 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 64000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 64001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 65000 | New Code | See Bill Text |