CA AB715 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 119 to the Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency Act (Chapter 510 of the Statutes of 1990), relating to the Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency.
Title
Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency: assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 715 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB715 Dickinson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 715 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB715 Dickinson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 715 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6095.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4252.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 1675.) |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 7). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 437 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |