CA AB715 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14105.18 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care programs: provider reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |