CA AB710 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26002 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 11150.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - AB 710 WOOD Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB710 Wood By Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 710 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-18AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5864.).
2018-06-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-14SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-02SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code101.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26002New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11150.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback