CA AB710 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 52060 and 52066 of the Education Code, relating to local control and accountability plans.
Title
Local control and accountability plans: youth on probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Brown. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Brown. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Brown. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 2574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |