CA AB710 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100503 of the Government Code, relating to health care coverage, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Health Benefit Exchange: multiemployer plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |