CA AB710 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - From inactive file. Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2453.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 19. Page 2474.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - From inactive file. Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2453.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 19. Page 2474.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 65200) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to local planning.
Title
Local planning: infill and transit-oriented development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Inactive File AB710 Skinner By Wolk (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB710 Skinner By Wolk (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB710 Skinner Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 710 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB710 Skinner By Wolk (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB710 Skinner Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 710 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-09 | From inactive file. Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2453.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 19. Page 2474.). | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wolk. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 19. Page 2140.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2140.) | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1778.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1673.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 75125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |