CA AB710 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 703 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to military and veterans.
Title
Veterans: substance abuse and mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 710 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 710 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH. | |
2009-05-27 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1670.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 703 | New Code | See Bill Text |