CA AB709 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 35012 and 35120 of the Education Code, relating to school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts: governing boards: pupil members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code35012Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code35120Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14011Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback