CA AB709 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 102013, 102018, 102050, 102051, 102105.1, 102107, 102160, 102206, 102260, 102281, 102282, 102310, and 102351 of, to repeal Sections 102336, 102353, and 102354 of, and to repeal and add Section 102352 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sacramento Regional Transit District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 709 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB709 McCarty By Pan (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-10-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 709 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 31).
2018-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2018-08-31AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 6091.).
2018-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-01SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2017-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1779.)
2017-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 10).
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22974.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code54220Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102013Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102018Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102050Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102051Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102100.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102100.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102105.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code102105.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102105.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code102107Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102160Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102206Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102242Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102243Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102260Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102281Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102282Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102310Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102332Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102336Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102351Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102352New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code102353Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102354Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code102356New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code102430Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback