CA AB709 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5371.4 and 5374 of, and add Section 5374.1 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to charter-party carriers.
Title
Charter-party carriers of passengers: driver background
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 5371.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5374 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5374.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |