CA AB705 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2282.5 of, and to add Sections 2057 and 2408.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 5917 and 5923 of the Corporations Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: facilities: medical privileges.
Sponsors
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2057 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2282.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2408.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5923 | Amended Code | Citation Text |