CA AB702 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30061 of the Government Code, and to repeal and add Section 749.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government financing: juvenile justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-12-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 30061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 749.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |