CA AB702 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Apr 27 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 122336) to Part 6 of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to animal breeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cat and dog breeding: permits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122336New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback