CA AB702 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50517.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing and community development, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Joe Serna, Jr. Farmworker Housing Grant Program:
Sponsors
Asm. Mary Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 702 SALAS Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB702 Salas Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 702 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB702 Salas Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 702 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6723.) | |
2010-08-25 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2010-08-24 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6557.) | |
2010-08-23 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-19 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4672.) | |
2010-08-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1958.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50517.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |