CA AB701 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 263.1 to the Penal Code, relating to sex crimes.
Title
Sex crimes: rape.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Patty Lopez [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 701 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB701 Cristina Garcia By Lara (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 701 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB701 Cristina Garcia By Lara (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 701 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6219.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4877.). |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1329.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19858 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 260 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 261.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 262 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 263.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |