CA AB700 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 977, 1043, and 1043.5 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: arraignment and trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB700 Cunningham By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 700 Cunningham Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 700 Cunningham Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2114.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1721.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1710.) |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1043.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |