CA AB7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6414 to the Labor Code, relating to emergency ambulance employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency ambulance employees: multithreat body protective gear.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 7 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB7 Rodriguez et al. By Cortese (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 7 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-04AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 9.).
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.).
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1694.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-06-16SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6414New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback