CA AB697 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66018.5 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: reports: preferential treatment: students related to donors or alumni.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AB 697 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB697 Ting et al. By Pan (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 697 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB697 Ting et al. By Pan (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 697 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2944.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 2280.). |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 1725.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66018.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |