CA AB694 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5aa (commencing with Section 998.700) to Chapter 6 of Division 4 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans’ housing, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.
Title
Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Bond Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 694 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 694 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, V.A. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1985.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 998.700 | New Code | See Bill Text |