CA AB691 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 590) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Sections 11346.2, 11346.3, 11346.5, and 11346.9 of the Government Code, relating to regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agency regulations and economic impact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-05-27 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2011-05-11 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-25 Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2011-04-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-04 Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2011-03-31 Referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2011-02-17 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code590New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11346.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11346.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11346.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11346.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback