CA AB69 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18924 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Senior nutrition benefits.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Betsy Butler [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] |
Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 69 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB69 Beall By Emmerson (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 69 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB69 Beall By Emmerson (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 69 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 2896.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 2203.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1716.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. | |
2010-12-15 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18924 | New Code | See Bill Text |