CA AB689 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 10509.910) to Chapter 5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to annuity transactions.
Title
Insurance: annuity transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Assembly - AB 689 BLUMENFIELD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB689 Blumenfield By Calderon (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 689 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB689 Blumenfield By Calderon (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 689 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2558.). | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.). | |
2011-08-17 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-28 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1634.) | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1583.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 789.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |