CA AB686 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23363.4 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: sales: distilled spirits.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 686 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1753.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23363.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25143.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25201.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25201.18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |