CA AB685 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add 17070.54 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities: athletics: compliance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 685 DAVIS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB685 Davis By Romero (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 685 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-28 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-09-09 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3195.)
2009-09-08 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-09-03 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2172.)
2009-09-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2009-08-31 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
2009-08-17 In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
2009-07-23 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-08 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-07-01 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-25 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-22 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-04 Referred to Com. on ED.
2009-05-18 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-18 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1545.)
2009-05-11 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6).
2009-04-23 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-22 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-21 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 15).
2009-03-23 Referred to Com. on ED.
2009-02-27 From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2009-02-26 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17070.54New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_685&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_bill_20090226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_bill_20090422_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_bill_20090723_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_bill_20090901_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_bill_20090911_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090415_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090518_1243PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090715_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090827_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090903_0327PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_685_vote_20090909_0349PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback