CA AB684 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2546.2, 2546.9, 2550.1, 2554, 2556, 2567, 3010.5, 3011, 3013 of, to add Sections 2556.1, 2556.2, 3020, 3021, 3023.1 to, and to repeal and add Section 655 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
State Board of Optometry: optometrists: nonresident contact lens sellers: registered dispensing opticians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 684 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB684 Alejo By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 684 ALEJO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB684 Alejo By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 684 ALEJO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3204.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2755.). |
2015-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 10). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1594.). |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1320.) From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |