CA AB683 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52055.57 of the Education Code, relating to local educational agencies, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Local educational agencies: program improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52055.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |