CA AB681 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 21 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 44332.5, 44332.6, and 44406 of, and to add Sections 44275.5 and 44275.6 to, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher credentialing: teacher preparation outside of the United States: temporary certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Assembly - AB 681 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB681 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 681 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44275.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44275.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44332.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44332.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44406Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback