CA AB681 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 56.104 of the Civil Code, relating to confidentiality of medical information.
Title
Confidentiality of medical information: psychotherapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 681 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB681 Hernandez By Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - AB 681 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB681 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 681 HERNANDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB681 Hernandez By Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - AB 681 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB681 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 681 HERNANDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2926.) | |
2009-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2023.) | |
2009-08-26 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-20 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2009-07-24 | Withdrawn from Enrollment. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2009-07-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2385.) | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-23 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1368.) | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |