CA AB676 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Read second time and amended.
Hearing: Jan 20 in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20015, 20022, and 20041 of, and to add Section 20044 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 31004, 31013, 31115, and 31306 of, and to add Sections 31126, 31212, 31221, and 31512.1 to, the Corporations Code, relating to franchises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franchises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 13).
2022-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2022-01-06Assembly(pending re-refer to com. on JUD.)
2022-01-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2022-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback