CA AB676 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6354.8 to the Labor Code, and to amend Section 1596.86 of, and to add Section 1596.8663 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to child care.
Title
Child care and development: occupational health and safety training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 676 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 676 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and L. & I.R. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1959.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 21). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1596.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.8663 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 6354.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1596.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1596.8663 | New Code | See Bill Text |