CA AB674 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18000 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to small business regulations.
Title
Microenterprise.
Sponsors
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB674 Quirk-Silva (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Assembly - AB 674 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Assembly - AB 674 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4141.). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3636.) |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 7). |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |