CA AB674 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9250.19 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Vehicles: registration fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB674 Bonilla By DeSaulnier (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 674 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 674 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-18 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1966.). | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 11). | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1653.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 9250.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |