CA AB673 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 99173 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transit operators.
Title
Public transit operators: bus procurement: safety considerations.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB673 Chu By Hill (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 673 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 673 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1938.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1645.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1540.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 24019 | New Code | See Bill Text |