CA AB673 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.9 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Probation and mandatory supervision: jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Assembly - AB 673 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #5 AB673 Santiago (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 673 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #5 AB673 Santiago (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 673 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2522.). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 977.) |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |